Constantinescu, Corina Mariana (CPSO#: 85282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RVAP
Department of Anaesthesia
580 Harwood Avenue South, Ajax
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Constantinescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Constantinescu ( CPSO# 85282 )

Business Address:
RVAP
Department of Anaesthesia
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINA MARIANA CONSTANTINESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONSTANTINESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 07 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Dec 2009 to 07 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Dec 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012