Contractor, Masuma Mahmood (CPSO#: 82825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sutie 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Muslim Welfare Centre
Unit 10
100 Mclevin Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 2V5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masuma Contractor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Contractor ( CPSO# 82825 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7753

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MASUMA MAHMOOD CONTRACTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONTRACTOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007