Contreras, Maya Judit (CPSO#: 101726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  16 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Maya Judit Contreras may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Contreras holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Contreras  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Contreras'
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Contreras'
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on January 1, 2016, and currently has an
                  interim expiry date of September 16, 2018.  The expiry date of this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.