Conway, Aoife Mary (CPSO#: 61182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )
Dr. R. Heyes ( CPSO# 26112 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AOIFE MARY CONWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONWAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1990