Conway, Emily Rosamund Dominique (CPSO#: 60657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
PO Bag 2007
Kemptville On K0G1J0
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Conway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Conway ( CPSO# 60657 )

Business Address:
KDH Health Centre
2675 Concession Road
PO Bag 2113
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY ROSAMUND DOMINIQUE CONWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990