Conyers, Roop (CPSO#: 76414)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007