Coode, Mary Catherine (CPSO#: 26658)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004