Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cook, Ashley Garrett (CPSO#: 66793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
328 Second St West
Cornwall ON  K6J 1G9
Phone: (613) 703-1962
Fax: (613) 703-1960
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Hospital
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley Cook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cook ( CPSO# 66793 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
328 Second street West
Cornwall ON  K6J 1G9
Phone Number: (613) 703-1962

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY GARRETT COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1998 to 04 May 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 05 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 19 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 20 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1999