Cook, David Franklin (CPSO#: 18869)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 20 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1996
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 20 Jul 1999

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 1999
Summary:

 On July 19, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Cook(s plea of guilty to professional 
 misconduct and found him guilty of professional misconduct as defined in clause 51(1)(a) of the 
 Health Professions Procedural Code which is schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 
 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18 in that he has been found guilty of an office that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practise medicine.  The Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Cook(s 
 certificate of registration forthwith.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 19, 1999