Cook, David Jonathan (CPSO#: 105511)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2015 to 24 May 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2016 to 31 May 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2016