Cook, Jolene Margaret (CPSO#: 85944)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 12 Feb 2007 to 12 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2007 to 08 Apr 2007
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2014