Cook, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 86719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Integra Health Centre
Unit 1320
130 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1K6
Phone: (416) 777-9355
Fax: (416) 777-9365
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

START Clinic for Mood and Anxiety
32 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N4
Canada
Phone: 416-598-9344
Fax: 416-598-8198
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Cook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cook ( CPSO# 86719 )

Business Address:
Integra Health Centre
130 King Street West
Suite 1320
Toronto ON  M5X 1K6
Phone Number: (416) 777-9355

Business Address:
START Clinic for Mood and Anxiety
32 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 598-9344

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2017