Cook, Sidney Douglas (CPSO#: 26910)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-2181
Fax: (705) 746-4753
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sidney Douglas Cook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cook ( CPSO# 26910 )

Business Address:
101 - 60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone Number: (705) 746-2181

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 101 60 Bowes St Parry Sound ON P2A 2L3
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018