Cook, Timothy John (CPSO#: 57212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite G2
145 Front Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 699-3636
Fax: (416) 546-1870
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1987