Cooke, Andrew Leighton (CPSO#: 43702)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Oct 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1994