Cooke, Carolyn June (CPSO#: 59760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4025 Yonge Street
Suite 215
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone: (416) 283-5539
Fax: (416) 283-1636
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.J. Cooke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cooke ( CPSO# 59760 )

Business Address:
215 - 4025 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 283-5539

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN JUNE COOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989