Cooke, Christy-Lynn Marie (CPSO#: 84805)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013