Cooke, Gabriel Michael (CPSO#: 21576)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015