Cooke, Michael John (CPSO#: 23454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 334-6239
Fax: (905) 949-5821
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN COOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1982