Cool, Derek William (CPSO#: 95560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd. East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 416-339-8366
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valiulis Cool Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Valiulis ( CPSO# 95565 )
Dr. D. Cool ( CPSO# 95560 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
Unit 2
388 Brunswick Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2Z4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK WILLIAM COOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016