Coombes, Robin Deneys (CPSO#: 75028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Coombes, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Coombes ( CPSO# 75028 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN DENEYS COOMBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOMBES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2005