Coombes, Wilfred Noble (CPSO#: 16569)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1957 RCPSC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1994