Cooney, Megan Joan (CPSO#: 99739)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2013 to 06 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016