Coop, Frederick William (CPSO#: 56643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
609 B Huron Ave.
Port Huron MI  48060
United States
Phone: (810) 985-0029
Fax: 770-666-9435
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

#20-700 Tecumseh Rd. E.
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Canada
Phone: (519) 255-7563 Ext. 1
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK WILLIAM COOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1986