Cooper, Alfred Joseph (CPSO#: 17729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Sep 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ojibwa

Education:University of Ottawa, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Rea Street North
Suite 203
Timmins ON  P4N 4Z5
Phone: (705) 264-0313
Fax: (705) 264-6481
Electoral District: 08

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1960
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 06 Nov 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1993
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1997
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1997
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As  from September 2, 1997, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College
            of Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Ontario,  the following terms, conditions and
            limitations are imposed on the certificate of  registration  held by Dr. Alfred
            Joseph Cooper:

            Assessment and Treatment

            1.    (1)   Prior  to  the  issuance  of  the certificate of registration,  Dr.
                        Cooper shall undergo an assessment  by a psychotherapist acceptable
                        to  the Registrar in order to develop  a  treatment  plan  for  Dr.
                        Cooper.

                  (2)   Prior  to  the  issuance  of  the  certificate of registration, Dr.
                        Cooper shall commence treatment under  the  plan developed for him.
                        Dr. Cooper shall then follow this treatment plan  developed for him
                        under subsection (1) above.
                  
            Therapist

            2.    (1)   Prior to the issuance of a certificate of registration, a therapist
                        acceptable to the Registrar shall give an undertaking in writing to
                        the Registrar.

                  (2)   In  the  undertaking,  the therapist shall agree to administer  the
                        treatment plan for two years  from  the  date  the  certificate  of
                        registration  is  issued  and  to  submit  written  reports  to the
                        Registrar,  in a form satisfactory to the Registrar, every 6 months
                        for two years from the date the certificate is issued, the first of
                        such  reports  to  be  submitted  prior  to  the  issuance  of  the
                        certificate of registration.  The reports are to indicate whether:
                  
                        (a)   Dr. Cooper is adhering to the treatment plan, and
                        (b)   the  therapist  has  observed  anything  suggesting  that Dr.
                              Cooper is unsuited to practise medicine.
                  
                  (3)   The  following  exceptions  apply  to  the  therapy  and  shall  be
                        contained in the therapist's undertaking:
                  
                        1.    If  Dr.  Cooper  is  adhering  to the treatment plan, and the
                              therapist  has  not  observed anything  suggesting  that  Dr.
                              Cooper is unsuited to  the  practice  of  medicine,  but  has
                              observed something which suggests that Dr. Cooper may benefit
                              from  further therapy, the therapy and reports shall continue
                              beyond  two  years  for  such  longer period as the Registrar
                              considers indicated in light of the therapist's report.
                  
                        2.    Even if the therapist is of the  opinion  that therapy is not
                              required, or is no longer required, Dr. Cooper shall continue
                              to  present  himself to the therapist for further  assessment
                              every six months for the two year period.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            Mentor/Monitor

            3.    (1)   Prior to the issuance  of  the  certificate  of  registration,  Dr.
                        Cooper  shall  retain  a  member  of  the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons   of   Ontario   acceptable   to   the  Registrar   as   a
                        mentor/monitor,  preferably a member who is a  certificant  of  the
                        College of Family Physicians of Canada.

                  (2)   Before the certificate  of  registration  is  issued, the Registrar
                        shall  be  satisfied that the mentor/monitor understands  correctly
                        the purpose  of  his  or her duties and responsibilities, including
                        the information required  in  the  reports described in subsections
                        3(5) and 3(6) below and the forms the reports should take.
                  
                  (3)   For the period of three years, Dr. Cooper  and  the  mentor/monitor
                        shall  meet for a minimum of 90 minutes a session to review  charts
                        chosen by Dr. Cooper and to discuss the clinical and ethical issues
                        arising from the charts.
                  
                  (4)   There shall  be a session during each month for the first 12 months
                        after Dr. Cooper  commences  practice  and there shall be a session
                        every three months for the following two years.
                  
                  (5)   Before   the   certificate   of   registration   is   issued,   the
                        mentor/monitor shall undertake to the College in writing: (I) to be
                        a mentor/monitor for Dr. Cooper in accordance with  this order, and
                        (ii) to submit written reports to the Registrar as required by this
                        order, in a form satisfactory to the Registrar, indicating whether:
                  
                        (a)   Dr. Cooper is attending the meetings required by  this order,
                              and
                        (b)   the mentor/monitor has observed anything suggesting  that Dr.
                              Cooper is not practising in an acceptable and ethical manner.
                  
                  (6)   The  mentor/monitor  shall  submit  one such report within 120 days
                        after Dr. Cooper commences practice and one such report every three
                        months  until  there have been four reports  and,  thereafter,  the
                        mentor/monitor shall  submit one such report every six months until
                        three years of mentoring/monitoring have passed in total.
                  
            Narcotics

            4.    Dr. Cooper shall not prescribe  narcotics  and, before the certificate of
                  registration  is issued, he shall provide a written  undertaking  to  the
                  Registrar not to  prescribe  narcotics  and a written confirmation to the
                  Bureau  of  Drug  Surveillance  that  he  is not  entitled  to  prescribe
                  narcotics.

            Anaesthesia

            5.    Dr. Cooper shall not practise anaesthesia.


            College of Family Physicians of Canada

            6.    (1)   Within 60 days of the issuance of the  certificate of registration,
                        Dr. Cooper shall join the College of Family  Physicians  of  Canada
                        and provide evidence to the Registrar that he has done so.

                  (2)   Dr.  Cooper shall thereafter maintain his membership in, and adhere
                        to the  annual  continuing  medical  education requirements of, the
                        College of Family Physicians of Canada.
                  
                  (3)   Each year, within 30 days of renewing  his  membership,  Dr. Cooper
                        shall  provide written evidence to the Registrar of his renewal  of
                        membership  in,  and  adherence  to  the  annual continuing medical
                        education  requirements  of,  the College of Family  Physicians  of
                        Canada.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 May 1991
Summary:

 In May 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cooper guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found 
 guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Committee further found Dr. 
 Cooper guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in 
 that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including 
 falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, contrary to s. 27(26); in 
 that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged 
 in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Cooper(s 
 licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 06 Nov 1992
Hearing Date(s): May 10, 1991

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 15 Apr 1996
Decision: Application Accepted