Cooper, Andrew Brent (CPSO#: 68674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Dept Anesthesia S2 508
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58439
Fax: 866 580 8965
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

16011 Airport Rd
Caledon East ON  L7C 1E7
Canada
Phone: (905) 860-0866
Fax: (866) 580-8965
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew B. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cooper ( CPSO# 68674 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
16011 Airport Road
Caledon ON  L7C 1E7
Phone Number: (905) 860-0866

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
S2 508-2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW BRENT COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996