Cooper, Judith Anne (CPSO#: 58248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avrum Soicher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Soicher ( CPSO# 62293 )
Dr. J. Cooper ( CPSO# 58248 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 456-3699

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988