Cooper, Krista Anne (CPSO#: 65385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Tunney's Pasture Driveway
address locator: 0202D2
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 948-6158
Fax: (613) 941-1365
Electoral District: 07


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KRISTA ANNE COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993