Cooper, Mary Anne (CPSO#: 65460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1040 Oliver Rd
Unit 103
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone: 807-767-7211
Fax: 807-767-8289
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cooper ( CPSO# 65460 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone Number: (807) 767-7211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ANNE COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993