Cooper, Pamela Jean (CPSO#: 50351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1986


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
6212 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone: (905) 640-5100
Fax: (905) 640-5102
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PAMELA JEAN COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986