Cooper, Paul Edward (CPSO#: 26608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
Room C7-004
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2906
Fax: (519) 663-2933
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 565 8500 Ext. Ext. 77681
Fax: (519) 667 6766
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cooper ( CPSO# 26608 )

Business Address:
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room C7-004
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2906

Business Address:
E5-222, 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-2906

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-2906

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904
Date Received: 08 May 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL EDWARD COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974