Cooper, Robert Avery (CPSO#: 65235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dufferin St Clair Community Clinic
1680 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone: (416) 658-6666
Fax: (416) 658-8106
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

188 Mississaga Street East
Orillia ON  L3V 1V9
Canada
Phone: (705) 329-4000
Fax: (705) 325-4402
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cooper ( CPSO# 65235 )

Business Address:
1680 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone Number: (416) 658-6666

Business Address:
188 Mississauga Street East
Orillia ON  L3V 1V9
Phone Number: (705) 329-4000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT AVERY COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993