Cooper, Sari Deanne (CPSO#: 73796)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eisen Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015