Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cooper, Stephen Corbishley (CPSO#: 66112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 549
15 Meredith Street East
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone: (705) 368-2450
Fax: (705) 368-2480
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Birch Island Health Centre
Box 12
Whitefish River ON  P0P 1A0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

Wikwemikong Health Centre
Wikwemikong ON  P0P 2J0
Canada
Phone: (705) 859-3166
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cooper ( CPSO# 66112 )

Business Address:
15 Meredith Street East
PO Box 549
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2450

Business Address:
Wikwemikong Health Centre
16A Complex Drive
PO Box 101
Wikwemikong ON  P0P 2J0
Phone Number: (705) 859-3166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CORBISHLEY COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1992