Cooray, Anurad Ruwan (CPSO#: 81225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Sinhalese

Education:Minsk State Medical Institute, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.R. Cooray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cooray ( CPSO# 81225 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANURAD RUWAN COORAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COORAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006