Cooray, Mohan Rajika (CPSO#: 93764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 Coxwell Avenue
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: 416-778-9467
Fax: 416-444-1663
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cooray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cooray ( CPSO# 93764 )

Business Address:
210 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 778-9467

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAN RAJIKA COORAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COORAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014