Cooter, Noel Brian Eaton (CPSO#: 20890)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 21 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1997