Coovadia, Mahomed Hoosein (CPSO#: 68552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Gujarati

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N0W8
Phone: 3066551000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
Saskatchewan
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHOMED HOOSEIN COOVADIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOVADIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012