Copeland, Joseph Edward (CPSO#: 73959)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Univ of California, Los Angeles, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2015