Corbett, Shannon Lee (CPSO#: 84272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Corbett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Corbett ( CPSO# 84272 )

Business Address:
The Reproductive Care Centre
101 - 2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone Number: (905) 816-9822

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON LEE CORBETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2012