Corbett, Thomas Bradley (CPSO#: 64620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre 699 Concession St Hamilton, ON L8V 5C2
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to the address above.
Date Received: 18 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 17 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS BRADLEY CORBETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993