Corbett, William Edward Nelson (CPSO#: 16664)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2002