Corbin, Jean Marc (CPSO#: 71694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: (705) 647-0173
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean M. Corbin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Corbin ( CPSO# 71694 )

Business Address:
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN MARC CORBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2000