Cordell, Bruce Alfred (CPSO#: 32898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
353 St Paul Avenue
Suite 200A
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone: (519) 759-4992
Fax: (519) 759-4993
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bruce A. Cordell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cordell ( CPSO# 32898 )

Business Address:
Suite 200A
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 759-4992

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE ALFRED CORDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORDELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1981