Cordy, Peter Edward (CPSO#: 25585)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Cordy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 23 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Box 655 Whistler, BC V0N 1B0
Date Received: 05 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015