Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Corey, Jo Ann Marie (CPSO#: 70025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Centre for Mountain Health Services
P O Box 585
100 West 5th
Hamilton ON  L9C 3N5
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36602
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Corey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Corey ( CPSO# 70025 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Centre for Mountain Health Services
P.O. Box 585
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 3N5
Phone Number: (905) 541-7780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JO ANN MARIE COREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COREY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2002