Cormack, James Gilbert (CPSO#: 58517)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 2005