Cormier, Christen Mary (CPSO#: 102209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quarry Medical
Suite 409
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 541-0270
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTEN MARY CORMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORMIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2016