Cormier, Marie Anne Rachel (CPSO#: 54669)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1994