Corneil, Glenn Gordon (CPSO#: 69182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2 - 240 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Corneil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Corneil ( CPSO# 69182 )

Business Address:
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN GORDON CORNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNEIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997